Brastianos, Charilaos Harry (CPSO#: 95454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
Faculty of Health Sciences
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Post Graduate Medical Education
70 Barrie Street
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Fax: (613) 533-2132
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARILAOS HARRY BRASTIANOS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BRASTIANOS is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BRASTIANOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BRASTIANOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BRASTIANOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BRASTIANOS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BRASTIANOS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019