Braunberger, Peter Grahame (CPSO#: 75221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sister Margaret Smith Centre
St Josephs Care Group
301 Lillie Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 0A6
Phone: (807) 684-5100
Fax: (807) 622-1779
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6200
Fax: (416) 813-2189
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Dilico Anishinabek Family Care
200 Anemki Place
Fort William First Nation
Thunder Bay ON  P7J 1L6
Canada
Phone: (807) 623-8511
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Meno Ya Win
1 meno ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T1B4
Canada
Phone: 18077373030
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Childrens Centre Thunder Bay
283 Lisgar Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6G6
Canada
Phone: (807) 343-5000
Fax: (807) 345-0444
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Braunberger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Braunberger ( CPSO# 75221 )

Business Address:
Telelink Mental Health - Sick Kids Hospital
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6200

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
Sister Margaret Smith Centre
301 Lillie Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 0A6
Phone Number: (807) 684-5100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GRAHAME BRAUNBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAUNBERGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005