Braverman, Aliza Shulamit (CPSO#: 95013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Drexel University College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 05 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Aug 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Aug 2015 Active View Details [+]

            As  from  August  12,  2015,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on the certificate of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Aliza  Shulamit
            Braverman, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Braverman
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Braverman has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.