Breau, Charles-Antoine (CPSO#: 93732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Selkirk st
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N1
Canada
Phone: 613-680-7444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

11 Selkirk st
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N1
Canada
Phone: 613-680-7444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles-Antoine Breau and P. Nicole LeBlanc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. LeBlanc ( CPSO# 92777 )
Dr. C. Breau ( CPSO# 93732 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES-ANTOINE BREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2013