Breau, Melanie Danielle (CPSO#: 92869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Eastern Ontario Health Centre
for Kids (NEO Kids)
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7120
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Breau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Breau ( CPSO# 92869 )

Business Address:
North Eastern Ontario Health Centre
for Kids (NEO Kids)
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE DANIELLE BREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2015