Brecher, Emily Rachel Plewik (CPSO#: 95729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sexual Health Centre
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: (613) 560-6096
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Canada
Phone: (613) 244-2822
Fax: (613) 244-2851
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Algonquin College
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Health Services, Room C141
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Canada
Phone: 613-727-4723 Ext. 7222
Fax: 613-727-3166
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brecher Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Brecher ( CPSO# 95729 )
Dr. C. Lin ( CPSO# 93399 )

Business Address:
Algonquin College
Health Services, Room C141
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Phone Number: (613) 727-4723

Business Address:
Sexual Health Centre
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Business Address:
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3

Business Address:
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-8262

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY RACHEL PLEWIK BRECHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRECHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2014