Bremer, Kimberly Nancy Margaret (CPSO#: 93139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 259-6249
Fax: 705-259-6251
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Bremer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bremer ( CPSO# 93139 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY NANCY MARGARET BREMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015