Bret, Patrice Marc Jacques (CPSO#: 71961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrice M. Bret Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: The medical records can be retrieved from the hospitals at which patients were treated.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Apr 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014