Breton-Fortin, Julie (CPSO#: 89027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Nipissing Community Health
Centre
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1B8
Phone: (705) 753-0151
Fax: 705-753-5387
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Breton-Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 19 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE BRETON-FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRETON-FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010