Brewster, Daniel Lee (CPSO#: 109757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL LEE BREWSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREWSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018