Bridges, Eileen Joan (CPSO#: 62245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN JOAN BRIDGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIDGES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018