Bridgland, Lindsay Jane (CPSO#: 94223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Floor Clinical Sciences Building
11350 83 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6G 2G3
Phone: (780) 492-9824
Fax: (780) 492-7277

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY JANE BRIDGLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIDGLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Jul 2010 to 20 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011