Briggs, Deborah Ellen (CPSO#: 59867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-106 Drynan Way
Box 70
Seeleys Bay ON  K0H 2N0
Phone: (613) 387-3120
Fax: (613) 387-2842
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Briggs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Briggs ( CPSO# 59867 )

Business Address:
1 - 106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay ON  K0H 2N0
Phone Number: (613) 387-3120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH ELLEN BRIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989