Brill, Yoav (CPSO#: 72290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 425-0113
Fax: (416) 425-0229
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Yoav Brill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Brill ( CPSO# 72290 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Business Address:
208 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 425-0112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOAV BRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003