Briskin, Alexander (CPSO#: 82362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:The Hebrew University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 64218
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Oullette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 255-2130
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Briskin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Briskin ( CPSO# 82362 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Operating Room
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Jul 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alexander Briskin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Briskin holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Briskin no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.