Briskin, Jonathan Kalouymus (CPSO#: 81692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tufts University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Mental Health Services East Wing
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5885
Fax: (519) 751-5898
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. K. Briskin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Briskin ( CPSO# 81692 )

Business Address:
Brant Community Healthcare System
The Brant General - Department of Psychiatry
200 Terrace Hill Street
E Wing
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN KALOUYMUS BRISKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007