Brockerville, Melissa Anne (CPSO#: 91068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences Centre 300 Prince Phillip Drive St Johns NL A1B 3V6
Date Received: 08 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE BROCKERVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROCKERVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2018