Bromberg, Rudy Mishael (CPSO#: 94834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Enhanced Care Clinic, Thornhill
7335 Yonge St, Unit A&C
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone: (905) 707-7309
Fax: (888) 979-6305
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Earl Bales Clinic
4256 Bathurst St #100
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Canada
Phone: 647-352-7188
Fax: 647-352-7190
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rudy M. Bromberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bromberg ( CPSO# 94834 )

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Unit A & C
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 7, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rudy Mishael Bromberg,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bromberg has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                           DR. RUDY BROMBERG
                                           ("Dr. Bromberg")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bromberg, certificate of registration number 94834, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214666 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and
                  Reports Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.



            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Bromberg, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), as follows:
                  
                        (i)   For a period of at least one (1) month, the Clinical
                              Supervisor will engage in a period of high supervision.  I
                              will only see patients in the presence of the Clinical
                              Supervisor, who will be present during my clinical visits,
                              and who will conduct a contemporaneous review of those
                              patient charts.  I will not be the Most Responsible Physician
                              for any patients during the period of high supervision.
                              During the period of high supervision, the Clinical
                              Supervisor shall provide bi-weekly reports to the College.
                              The Clinical Supervisor(s) shall reconsider the need for high
                              supervision after the first month, and at the beginning of
                              every month thereafter for so long as the period of high
                              supervision continues.  If the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              believes that I am ready to practise under moderate
                              supervision, he or she shall provide the College with a
                              report addressing the practise concerns raised by the medical
                              inspector, dated March 20, 2016, and explaining why my
                              progress under high supervision justifies a transition to
                              moderate level of supervision.  The period of high
                              supervision will continue until the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              and the College agree that the level of supervision may be
                              reduced to moderate supervision;
                  
                        (ii)  Following the period of high supervision described in
                              paragraph (6)(a)(i) above, and provided that the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) and the College agree that the level of
                              supervision can be reduced, for a further five (5) months, at
                              a minimum, the Clinical  Supervisor will engage in a period
                              of moderate supervision, during which time he or she will
                              meet with me on a weekly basis to review a minimum of ten
                              (10) of his patient records and discuss any issues or
                              concerns arising therefrom.  If, during this period, I have
                              fewer than ten (10) patient encounters in any given specific
                              week, the Clinical Supervisor shall review the records of all
                              patient encounters during that period.  During the period of
                              moderate supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) shall
                              provide monthly reports to the College; and
                  
                        (iii) Following the period of moderate supervision described in
                              paragraph (6)(a)(ii) above, provided that the Clinical
                              Supervisor and the College agree that the level of
                              supervision can be reduced, for a further six (6) months, at
                              a minimum, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will engage in a period
                              of low supervision, during which time he or she will meet
                              with me on a monthly basis to review a minimum of ten (10) of
                              his patient records and discuss any issues or concerns
                              arising therefrom.  If, during this period, I have fewer than
                              ten (10) patient encounters in a specific month, the Clinical
                              Supervisor shall review the records of all patient encounters
                              during that period.  The Clinical Supervisor shall provide
                              monthly reports to the College.
                  
                  (b)   The combined period of supervision set out in paragraph (6)(a)
                        above ("Clinical Supervision") shall not be less than twelve (12)
                        months.  Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval from
                        the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspector dated March 20, 2016, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to ensure that Schedule "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Bromberg, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(f) and/or
                        (g) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                        (i)   I, Dr. Bromberg, agree that if I am required to cease
                              practise as a result of section (6)(h) above this will
                              constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate
                              of registration and that term, condition or limitation will
                              be included on the public register.
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        cease to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions
                        for any of the following substances except for the sole and limited
                        purpose of complying with the clinical supervision and
                        re-assessment requirements set out in this undertaking (the
                        "Practice Restrictions"):
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "C"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "D")
                  
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "E");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge and undertake that the Practice
                        Restrictions shall remain in effect until all of the professional
                        education, clinical supervision and re-assessment requirements set
                        out herein are completed to the satisfaction of the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that in making its determination that
                        I may independently prescribe the substances listed in section
                        (8)(a) above, the College may require that I sign an undertaking
                        imposing terms, conditions and limitations on my certificate of
                        registration or requiring ongoing re-assessments, clinical
                        supervision and/or monitoring. 
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Schedule "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Bromberg, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall
                        post a sign in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in
                        a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "F."  For further clarity, this sign shall state as
                        follows: 
                  
                        "Dr. Bromberg may only prescribe the following substances with the
                        co-signature of another physician: 
                  
                              *     Narcotic Drugs
                              *     Narcotic Preparations
                              *     Controlled Drugs
                              *     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              *     All other Monitored Drugs. 
                  
                        Where Dr. Bromberg is considering prescribing these substances,
                        another physician must be present for the initial patient
                        assessment.  Dr. Bromberg's treatment plans for these substances
                        must be co-signed by another physician.  Further information may be
                        found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website
                        at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (10)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Schedule "F." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (10)(c).
                  
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Schedule "G".
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.


            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 


            (15)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code.  I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (17)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Bromberg was the subject of a College investigation into
                        whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent
                        in his family practice.  As a result of the investigation, Dr.
                        Bromberg may only issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for any of the following substances for the sole and
                        limited purpose of complying with a period of clinical supervision
                        and reassessment.
                  
                        Dr. Bromberg shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms
                        of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr.
                        Bromberg may only prescribe the following substances with the
                        co-signature of another physician: 
                  
                              *     Narcotic Drugs
                              *     Narcotic Preparations
                              *     Controlled Drugs
                              *     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              *     All other Monitored Drugs. 
                  
                        Where Dr. Bromberg is considering prescribing these substances,
                        another physician must be present for the initial patient
                        assessment.  Dr. Bromberg's treatment plans for these substances
                        must be co-signed by another physician.  Further information may be
                        found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website
                        at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rudy Mishael Bromberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 7, 2017:

Dr. Bromberg was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Bromberg may only issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances for the sole and limited purpose of complying with a period of clinical supervision and reassessment.

Dr. Bromberg shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Bromberg may only prescribe the following substances with the co-signature of another physician:

• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• All other Monitored Drugs.

Where Dr. Bromberg is considering prescribing these substances, another physician must be present for the initial patient assessment. Dr. Bromberg’s treatment plans for these substances must be co-signed by another physician. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.