Brook, Shelley Carolyn (CPSO#: 53188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
17th Floor Room 17056
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3859
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Street East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-6315
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Brook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brook ( CPSO# 53188 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 17th Floor
Room 17056
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060


Corporation Name: Donald A. Wasylenki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wasylenki ( CPSO# 25087 )
Dr. S. Brook ( CPSO# 53188 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
17th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY CAROLYN BROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1983