Brookes, Jonathan (CPSO#: 94090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital Site
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 34422
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jonathan Brookes may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Brookes holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Brookes no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Brookes' clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Brookes' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.


            Note: This certificate is issued on July 27, 2012, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Brookes' academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.