Brooks, Marni Allyson (CPSO#: 73837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Cannabis Clinics
2-80 King St.
St Catharines ON  L2R 7G1
Phone: (888) 256-7043
Fax: (888) 261-7116
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Vector Medical
1136 Centre St.
Vaughan ON  L4J 3M8
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-5744
Fax: (289) 695-0059
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

N/A-house calls
Toronto ON  M5V 2Y1
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888)745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marni Allyson Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brooks ( CPSO# 73837 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
80 King Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7G1

Business Address:
57 Spadina Avenue
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M5V 2J2

Business Address:
1136 Centre Street
Vaughan ON  L4J 3M8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARNI ALLYSON BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001