Brooks, Steven Charles (CPSO#: 82871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven C. Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brooks ( CPSO# 82871 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN CHARLES BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006