Brooks, Tyler Duncan Poth (CPSO#: 89362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces
National Defence Headquarters
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K6
Phone: (613) 971-7825
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (614) 825-0544
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TYLER DUNCAN POTH BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010