Brophy, Jason Clarence (CPSO#: 79919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
Division Of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2651
Fax: (613) 738-4832
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital For Sick Children
Division Of Infectious Diseases
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 4649
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON CLARENCE BROPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006