Brophy, Julie Dawn (CPSO#: 93042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone: (519) 837-2020 Ext. 280
Fax: 519-837-3454
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie D. Brophy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brophy ( CPSO# 93042 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE DAWN BROPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015