Brousseau, Marie-Claude (CPSO#: 86171)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Suite 110 265 Front Street Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7X1
Date Received: 12 Jun 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008