Brown, Andrew Robert (CPSO#: 94375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Frank Miller Dr.
Department of Anesthesia
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew R. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 94375 )

Business Address:
Huntsville Hospital, Department of Anesthesia
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011