Brown, Brittany Jean (CPSO#: 92795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5841
Fax: (519) 846-8453
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

801 Saint David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-1591
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brittany Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Brown ( CPSO# 92795 )

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5841

Business Address:
801 David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRITTANY JEAN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012