Brown Broderick, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 91100)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6 T: 613-798-5555
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2010 to 16 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2011 to 16 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017