Brown, Dierdre Kathleen (CPSO#: 69345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London ON  N5X 0H7
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brown & Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brown ( CPSO# 69345 )
Dr. K. Hollohan ( CPSO# 69463 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London ON  N5X 0H7
Phone Number: (519) 386-6936

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIERDRE KATHLEEN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2008