Brown, Emmanuel Joseph Peter (CPSO#: 28189)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Cochrane Family Health Team 4 - 233 Eighth St Cochrane, ON P0L 1C0 Tel: 705-272-4200 Fax: 705-272-2676
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018


Address: P O Box 1600 233 8th Street Cochrane ON P0L 1C0 Tel: 705-272-4200 Fax: 705-272-2676
Date Received: 08 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018