Brown, Ian Richard (CPSO#: 65710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Fax: (905) 641-2261
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian R. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Brown ( CPSO# 65710 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 641-5556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RICHARD BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993