Brown, James Craymer (CPSO#: 92084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Interventional Pain Specialists
9625 Yonge St
Unit 1-A
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone: 905 237 4623
Fax: 905 237 5098
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James C. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 92084 )
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 22173 )

Business Address:
Unit 1-A
9625 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  James  Craymer Brown may practise medicine independently in Interventional
            Chronic Pain Management, only.