Brown, Jamie Campbell (CPSO#: 81300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A3 - ICU
Peterborough Regional Health Ctre
#1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5063
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Brown & Hardy-Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hardy-Brown ( CPSO# 85110 )
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 81300 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
ICU A3
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5063

Business Address:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE CAMPBELL BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008