Brown, Kaitlyn Louise (CPSO#: 97999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3-59 King Street West
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone: 519 786 4545
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAITLYN LOUISE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2014