Brown, Lukas Benjamin (CPSO#: 103064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3283
Electoral District: 02

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Lukas  Benjamin  Brown  shall  practise  medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which  Dr. Brown is enrolled at
                  the University of Western Ontario.

            (2)   In  Dr. Brown's practice in the postgraduate medical  education  program,
                  Dr. Brown shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
                  clinical  teaching  unit  that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Brown is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned  by the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Brown's practice in the postgraduate  medical  education  program,
                  Dr. Brown shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Brown may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent  of
                  his  employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr.  Brown's  practice  specified  in paragraph (4), Dr. Brown may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires,  and  Dr.  Brown must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Brown is no longer enrolled in a program  of  postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Brown  no  longer  holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or a valid employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Brown  must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education  program  if  any  one  of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College  of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr.  Brown's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Brown's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Brown  to  engage  in  practice  outside   the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  Brown's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Brown  takes  a  leave  of  absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion  to   a   regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Brown  may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Brown  applies  for  a  new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on February 22, 2018.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate  of  registration  expires  on  June 30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.