Brown, Marty Harold (CPSO#: 84849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 - 145 Station St
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 968-6303
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marty Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 84849 )

Business Address:
201-145 Station Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone Number: (613) 771-1910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTY HAROLD BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009