Brown, Mitchell Spencer (CPSO#: 87599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell Spencer Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 89059 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 87599 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITCHELL SPENCER BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 24 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010