Brown, Nancy-Shira Elizabeth (CPSO#: 76616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Names: Pringle, Nancy-Shira Elizabeth (used until: 01 Jul 2009 )     Pringle, Nancy Elizabeth (used until: 01 Sep 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: American Sign Language, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland Hospital
3rd Street
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY-SHIRA ELIZABETH BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003