Brown, Pierre Antoine (CPSO#: 81290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82573
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Antoine Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brown ( CPSO# 81290 )

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE ANTOINE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008