Brown, Russell Edwin (CPSO#: 95350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell E. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Brown ( CPSO# 95350 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL EDWIN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016