Browne, Janis Lynn (CPSO#: 55878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2409 Yonge Sreet
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (416) 785-5001
Fax: (416) 785-6539
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janis Browne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Browne ( CPSO# 55878 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Suite 301
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 785-5001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANIS LYNN BROWNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)