Bruce, Aisha Aiko Kanashiro (CPSO#: 79191)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2009 to 09 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 08 May 2010 to 23 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2010