Bruinsma, David Ryan (CPSO#: 89051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905 522-1155 Ext. 38510
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bruinsma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bruinsma ( CPSO# 89051 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RYAN BRUINSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUINSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010