Bruma, Cleopatra Virginia (CPSO#: 81316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ridgeview Long Term Care Centre
385 Highland Road West
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3X9
Canada
Phone: (905) 561-3332
Fax: (905) 561-3337
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cleopatra Bruma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bruma ( CPSO# 81316 )

Business Address:
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 547-0508

Business Address:
Ridgeview Long Term Care Centre
385 Highland Road West
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3X9
Phone Number: (905) 561-3332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLEOPATRA VIRGINIA BRUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007