Brundage, Michael Donald (CPSO#: 52901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Michael Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DONALD BRUNDAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNDAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Other - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988