Brunet, Melissa Pauline (CPSO#: 110086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  17 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA PAULINE BRUNET shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BRUNET is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BRUNET shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BRUNET is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BRUNET shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BRUNET is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BRUNET no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 17 Dec 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2018