Brunton, Gillian Mary (CPSO#: 90114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Newcastle Village Medical
Associates
87 Mill Street North
Newcastle ON  L1B 1H8
Phone: (905) 987-1896
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN MARY BRUNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2010