Bruppacher, Heinz Rudolf (CPSO#: 89953)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Basel, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 16 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2011