Bryan, Jennifer Marie (CPSO#: 89014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: Ahmed, Jennifer Marie (used until: 12 Feb 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R3J7
Canada
Phone: 9054946526
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.M. Bryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bryan ( CPSO# 89014 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE GS-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (476) 340-3111

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6526

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7532

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARIE BRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013